# Use mental and written strategies to multiply two- and three-digit numbers by two-digit numbers, including: using an area model for two-digit by two-digit multiplication, factorising the numbers, using the extended form (long multiplication) of the formal

 1 Number detectives: 12 x 20 2 Multiplication simplification: 42 x 16 3 Multiplication simplification: 34 x 12 4 Multiplication simplification: 29x24 5 Multiplication simplification: 42 x 24 6 Multiplication simplification: 26 x 16 7 Same or Different: Click all the boxes with the same answer. 8 Multiplication Simplification: 48x16 9 Multiplication Simplification: 88x24 10 Multiplication Simplification: 94x32 11 Multiplication Simplification: 56x64 12 Multiplication Simplification: 64x36 13 Maths production: Put the correct ending on each multiplication sentence 14 Maths production: Put the correct ending on each multiplication sentence 15 Multiplication Simplification: Use doubling and halving to simplify multiplication 16 Multiplication Simplification: Use doubling and halving to simplify multiplication 17 Multiplication Simplification: Use doubling and halving to simplify multiplication 18 Multiplication Simplification: Use doubling and halving to simplify multiplication 19 Multiplication Simplification: Use doubling and halving to simplify multiplication 20 Same or different: Click the box where the answer is different 21 Same or different: Are these products the same?